NY S02523 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-07 - SIGNED CHAP.433
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Decriminalizes the possession and sale of hypodermic needles and syringes; regulates the sale of hypodermic needles and syringes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Decriminalizes the possession and sale of hypodermic needles and syringes; regulates the sale of hypodermic needles and syringes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-07SenateSIGNED CHAP.433
2021-10-06SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2021-06-10Assemblyreturned to senate
2021-06-10Assemblypassed assembly
2021-06-10Assemblyordered to third reading cal.160
2021-06-10Assemblysubstituted for a868
2021-06-07Assemblyreferred to codes
2021-06-07SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2021-06-07SenatePASSED SENATE
2021-06-03SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1484
2021-06-03SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2021-01-21SenateREFERRED TO CODES

Same As/Similar To

A00868 (Same As) 2021-06-10 - substituted by s2523

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback