NY S02523 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-01 - SIGNED CHAP.10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the extension for payment of real property taxes by furloughed or designated non-pay federal employees; requires documentation; relates to the repayment of extensions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the extension for payment of real property taxes by furloughed or designated non-pay federal employees; requires documentation; relates to the repayment of extensions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 87 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-01AssemblySIGNED CHAP.10
2019-01-29SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2019-01-28Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-01-28Assemblypassed assembly
2019-01-28Assemblyruling of chair on point of order
2019-01-28Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.28
2019-01-28Assemblysubstituted for a2852
2019-01-28Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2019-01-28SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-01-28SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-01-28SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.96
2019-01-25SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A02852 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - substituted by s2523

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback