NY S02511 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-3)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-08 - PRINT NUMBER 2511A
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-08 - PRINT NUMBER 2511A
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to truth and fairness in asbestos litigation; provides for requirements in trust claims.
Title
Relates to truth and fairness in asbestos litigation; provides for requirements in trust claims.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2511A |
2018-06-08 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2018-06-07 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-03-06 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2017-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A06032 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to judiciary
A10964 (Same As) 2018-05-29 - referred to judiciary
A10964 (Same As) 2018-05-29 - referred to judiciary