NY S02508 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - SIGNED CHAP.58
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - SIGNED CHAP.58
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts into law major components of legislation necessary to implement the state transportation, economic development and environmental conservation budget for the 2021-2022 state fiscal year; extends the authorization of the loan powers of the New York state urban development corporation (Part J); extends the authority of the New York state urban development corporation to administer the empire state economic development fund (Part K); relates to the effectiveness of certain provisions transferring the statutory authority for the promulgation of marketing orders from the department of agriculture and markets to the New York state urban development corporation (Part M); permits the secretary of state to provide special handling for all documents filed or issued by the division of corporations; permits additional levels of such expedited service (Part N); authorizes the New York state energy research and development authority to finance a portion of its research, development and demonstration, policy and planning, and Fuel NY program, as well as climate change related expenses of the department of environmental conservation and the department of agriculture and markets' Fuel NY program, from an assessment on gas and electric corporations (Part W); authorizes certain counties to permanently and temporarily convey certain easements and to temporarily alienate certain parklands to implement the Bay Park conveyance project (Part Z); extends certain brownfield credit periods that expire on or after 3/20/20 and before 12/31/21 for two years (Part AA); relates to the "Cleaner, Greener NY Act" (Part CC); relates to demonstrations and tests consisting of the operation of a motor vehicle equipped with autonomous vehicle technology and the required submission of a report relating thereto (Part GG); extends authorization for the dormitory authority to enter into certain design and construction management agreements (Part II); relates to the covered period for forbearance of residential mortgage payments (Part LL); authorizes utility and cable television assessments that provide funds to certain departments (Part WW).
Title
Enacts into law major components of legislation necessary to implement the state transportation, economic development and environmental conservation budget for the 2021-2022 state fiscal year; extends the authorization of the loan powers of the New York state urban development corporation (Part J); extends the authority of the New York state urban development corporation to administer the empire state economic development fund (Part K); relates to the effectiveness of certain provisions transferring the statutory authority for the promulgation of marketing orders from the department of agriculture and markets to the New York state urban development corporation (Part M); permits the secretary of state to provide special handling for all documents filed or issued by the division of corporations; permits additional levels of such expedited service (Part N); authorizes the New York state energy research and development authority to finance a portion of its research, development and demonstration, policy and planning, and Fuel NY program, as well as climate change related expenses of the department of environmental conservation and the department of agriculture and markets' Fuel NY program, from an assessment on gas and electric corporations (Part W); authorizes certain counties to permanently and temporarily convey certain easements and to temporarily alienate certain parklands to implement the Bay Park conveyance project (Part Z); extends certain brownfield credit periods that expire on or after 3/20/20 and before 12/31/21 for two years (Part AA); relates to the "Cleaner, Greener NY Act" (Part CC); relates to demonstrations and tests consisting of the operation of a motor vehicle equipped with autonomous vehicle technology and the required submission of a report relating thereto (Part GG); extends authorization for the dormitory authority to enter into certain design and construction management agreements (Part II); relates to the covered period for forbearance of residential mortgage payments (Part LL); authorizes utility and cable television assessments that provide funds to certain departments (Part WW).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 106 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 106 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-19 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.58 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-04-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-04-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-04-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.53 |
2021-04-06 | Assembly | substituted for a3008c |
2021-04-06 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-04-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-04-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-04-06 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.648 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2508C |
2021-03-29 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2021-03-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2508B |
2021-03-13 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2021-02-24 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2508A |
2021-02-24 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2021-01-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A03008 (Same As) 2021-04-06 - substituted by s2508c