NY S02507 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-01-15 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the office of alcoholism and substance abuse services to develop training materials for health care providers and qualified health professionals, recognized by the office to enable the implementation of the screening, brief intervention, and referral to treatment program, regarding screening for alcoholism and chemical dependency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the office of alcoholism and substance abuse services to develop training materials for health care providers and qualified health professionals, recognized by the office to enable the implementation of the screening, brief intervention, and referral to treatment program, regarding screening for alcoholism and chemical dependency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Alcoholism and Substance Abuse Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Alcoholism and Substance Abuse Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-15SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2020-01-14Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2020-01-13Senate1ST REPORT CAL.65
2020-01-08SenateREFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE ABUSE
2020-01-08Assemblyreturned to senate
2020-01-08Assemblydied in assembly
2019-05-13Assemblyreferred to alcoholism and drug abuse
2019-05-13SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-05-13SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-05-08SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-05-07Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-05-06Senate1ST REPORT CAL.580
2019-01-25SenateREFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE ABUSE

Same As/Similar To

A03391 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to alcoholism and drug abuse

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback