NY S02494 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3534
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3534
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a three year term limit for members of the autism spectrum disorders advisory board.
Title
Establishes a three year term limit for members of the autism spectrum disorders advisory board.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-13 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A3534 |
2023-02-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-02-14 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-02-13 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.343 |
2023-01-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO DISABILITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A03534 (Same As) 2023-05-11 - signed chap.60