NY S02493 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION
Pending: Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks and Recreation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION
Pending: Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks and Recreation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides senior citizens shall be entitled to use any park, recreational facility or historic site without the imposition of any fee or other charge; defines senior citizens as persons 62 years of age or older.
Title
Provides senior citizens shall be entitled to use any park, recreational facility or historic site without the imposition of any fee or other charge; defines senior citizens as persons 62 years of age or older.
Sponsors
Sen. Jose Serrano [D] | Sen. Jamaal Bailey [D] | Sen. John Liu [D] | Sen. James Sanders [D] |
Sen. Diane Savino [D] | Sen. Andrea Stewart-Cousins [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks and Recreation Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks and Recreation Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
2019-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1481 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-04-09 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-01-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |