NY S02490 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires putrescible and non-putrescible waste to be covered by a hard tarp when transported by rail.
Title
Requires putrescible and non-putrescible waste to be covered by a hard tarp when transported by rail.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Leroy Comrie [D] | Sen. John Liu [D] |
Sen. Zellnor Myrie [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-21 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2020-07-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-02-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-02-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.344 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2019-06-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-03 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1131 |
2019-06-03 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-01-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A03269 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to environmental conservation