NY S02489 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes certain local municipal agencies to use surveillance cameras to combat illegal dumping.
Title
Authorizes certain local municipal agencies to use surveillance cameras to combat illegal dumping.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2019-05-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-04-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-04-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.426 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-01-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A01212 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to environmental conservation