NY S02485 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-10-20 - VETOED MEMO.6831
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-10-20 - VETOED MEMO.6831
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the chancellor of the city school district of city over 1 million to inventory and report on the outdoor playgrounds of such district.
Title
Directs the chancellor of the city school district of city over 1 million to inventory and report on the outdoor playgrounds of such district.
Sponsors
Sen. Ruben Diaz [D] | Sen. Pedro Espada [D] | Sen. Jeffrey Klein [D] | Sen. Liz Krueger [D] |
Sen. Velmanette Montgomery [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 4 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-10-20 | VETOED MEMO.6831 | |
2010-10-08 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | |
2010-06-29 | returned to senate | |
2010-06-29 | passed assembly | |
2010-06-29 | ordered to third reading rules cal.433 | |
2010-06-29 | substituted for a7603a | |
2010-06-18 | referred to ways and means | |
2010-06-18 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-06-18 | PASSED SENATE | |
2010-06-18 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1010 | |
2010-06-17 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | |
2010-06-10 | PRINT NUMBER 2485A | |
2010-06-10 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION | |
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO EDUCATION | |
2009-02-20 | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A7603 (Same As) 2010-06-29 - substituted by s2485a