NY S02478 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits the use of a facial recognition system by a landlord on any residential premises.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits the use of a facial recognition system by a landlord on any residential premises.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-07SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2024-05-16SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2024-05-15Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2024-05-14Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1087
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO JUDICIARY
2023-01-20SenateREFERRED TO JUDICIARY

Same As/Similar To

A00322 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to housing

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback