NY S02473 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-09 - PRINT NUMBER 2473A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-09 - PRINT NUMBER 2473A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the responsible retirement of racehorses fund; establishes a horse registration fee; provides such funds be expended to support responsible retirement of racehorses in this state.
Title
Creates the responsible retirement of racehorses fund; establishes a horse registration fee; provides such funds be expended to support responsible retirement of racehorses in this state.
Sponsors
Sen. Kenneth LaValle [R] | Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. Marisol Alcantara [D] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] |
Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] | Sen. James Tedisco [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-09 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2473A |
2018-02-09 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2017-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A04220 (Same As) 2018-03-29 - print number 4220a