NY S02459 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-01 - SIGNED CHAP.317
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Makes certain findings and determinations with respect to certain bond anticipation notes issued by the city school district of the city of Binghamton, and authorizes the issuance of obligations of such school district with respect thereto; authorizes certain bond anticipation notes to be renewed and the maturity thereof, including the maturity of renewals thereof, to extend for a period not to exceed seven years beyond the respective original date of issue of such bond anticipation notes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Makes certain findings and determinations with respect to certain bond anticipation notes issued by the city school district of the city of Binghamton, and authorizes the issuance of obligations of such school district with respect thereto; authorizes certain bond anticipation notes to be renewed and the maturity thereof, including the maturity of renewals thereof, to extend for a period not to exceed seven years beyond the respective original date of issue of such bond anticipation notes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-01AssemblySIGNED CHAP.317
2019-10-01SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2019-06-18Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-18Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-18Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.267
2019-06-18Assemblysubstituted for a5483a
2019-06-13Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2019-06-13SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-13SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-13SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1335
2019-06-13SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2019-05-30SenatePRINT NUMBER 2459A
2019-05-30SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2019-01-25SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Same As/Similar To

A05483 (Same As) 2019-06-18 - substituted by s2459a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback