NY S02458 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the town of Hancock, county of Delaware, to alienate and convey certain parcels of land used as parklands.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the town of Hancock, county of Delaware, to alienate and convey certain parcels of land used as parklands.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 123 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-20Assemblyhome rule request
2019-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.641
2019-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a4748a
2019-06-19Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2019-06-19AssemblyRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-19SenateREPASSED SENATE
2019-06-19SenateHOME RULE REQUEST
2019-06-12SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 2458A
2019-06-12SenateVOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING
2019-06-12Senatereturned to senate
2019-06-12AssemblyRECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY
2019-06-11Assemblyreferred to local governments
2019-06-11SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-11SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-11SenateHOME RULE REQUEST
2019-06-11SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1240
2019-06-11SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2019-01-25SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Same As/Similar To

A04748 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - substituted by s2458a

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02458&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02458&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S02458
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02458&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S02458A
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S2458#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S2458#SF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S2458#SF2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02458&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback