NY S02450 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-10 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the provision of special education services at charter schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the provision of special education services at charter schools.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-06-10Assemblyreferred to education
2014-06-10SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2014-06-10SenatePASSED SENATE
2014-05-28SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2014-05-21Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2014-05-20Senate1ST REPORT CAL.836
2014-02-27SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2014-01-08SenateREFERRED TO EDUCATION
2013-06-21SenateRECOMMITTED TO RULES
2013-06-13SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 2450A
2013-06-12SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1317
2013-06-12SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2013-02-12SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2013-01-17SenateREFERRED TO EDUCATION

Same As/Similar To

A04315 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - referred to education

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback