NY S02440 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-26 - referred to racing and wagering
Pending: Assembly Racing and Wagering Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-26 - referred to racing and wagering
Pending: Assembly Racing and Wagering Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Eases certain restrictions on the conducting of games of chance for charitable purposes; authorizes auxiliary members of authorized organizations to operate games of chance; authorizes conducting of games of chance on Sundays; expands advertising of games of chance; eases certain restrictions on the conducting of bingo games for charitable purposes; expands the frequency upon which bingo games may be held; authorizes auxiliary members of authorized organizations to conduct bingo games; authorizes the conducting of bingo games on Sundays; expands advertising of bingo games.
Title
Eases certain restrictions on the conducting of games of chance for charitable purposes; authorizes auxiliary members of authorized organizations to operate games of chance; authorizes conducting of games of chance on Sundays; expands advertising of games of chance; eases certain restrictions on the conducting of bingo games for charitable purposes; expands the frequency upon which bingo games may be held; authorizes auxiliary members of authorized organizations to conduct bingo games; authorizes the conducting of bingo games on Sundays; expands advertising of bingo games.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-26 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |
2014-02-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-02-26 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-02-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-02-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.90 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2013-05-21 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |
2013-05-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-05-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-05-20 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-05-08 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-05-07 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.570 |
2013-01-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
Same As/Similar To
A04150 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - referred to racing and wagering