NY S02435 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-12 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the county of Nassau to accept an application for retroactive real property tax exemption from the First Reformed Church of Jamaica for a certain parcel in Hempstead.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the county of Nassau to accept an application for retroactive real property tax exemption from the First Reformed Church of Jamaica for a certain parcel in Hempstead.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-12SenateRECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
2019-05-29SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 2435A
2019-05-08SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-05-07Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-05-06Senate1ST REPORT CAL.565
2019-01-24SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Same As/Similar To

A06923 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - substituted by s6508a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback