NY S02422 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to manufacturers reporting the sale or distribution of firearms to the department of criminal justice services.
Title
Relates to manufacturers reporting the sale or distribution of firearms to the department of criminal justice services.
Sponsors
Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2019-12-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2422A |
2019-12-11 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2019-01-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A02486 (Same As) 2020-01-17 - print number 2486a