NY S02416 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-04 - signed chap.245
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a time period in which an action to recover damages for injury arising from domestic violence must be brought.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes a time period in which an action to recover damages for injury arising from domestic violence must be brought.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-04Senatesigned chap.245
2019-09-03Assemblydelivered to governor
2019-05-14AssemblyRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-05-14AssemblyPASSED SENATE
2019-05-14Assembly3RD READING CAL.186
2019-05-14AssemblySUBSTITUTED FOR S2416
2019-05-14AssemblyREFERRED TO JUDICIARY
2019-05-14Senatedelivered to senate
2019-05-14Senatepassed assembly
2019-02-21Senateadvanced to third reading cal.58
2019-02-11Senatereported
2019-01-28Senatereported referred to codes
2019-01-18Senatereferred to judiciary
2019-05-14SenateSUBSTITUTED BY A1945
2019-03-04SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-02-28Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-02-27Senate1ST REPORT CAL.186
2019-01-24SenateREFERRED TO JUDICIARY

Same As/Similar To

A01945 (Same As) 2019-09-04 - signed chap.245

New York State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback