NY S02414 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-07-31 - DELIVERED TO SECRETARY OF STATE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-07-31 - DELIVERED TO SECRETARY OF STATE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows public utility lines and bicycle paths on certain state lands in the forest preserve and establishes a forest preserve health and safety land account.
Title
Allows public utility lines and bicycle paths on certain state lands in the forest preserve and establishes a forest preserve health and safety land account.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-31 | Senate | DELIVERED TO SECRETARY OF STATE |
2017-06-28 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2017-06-28 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-28 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.695 |
2017-06-28 | Assembly | substituted for a8301 |
2017-03-31 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2017-03-31 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-03-31 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-03-21 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-03-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.427 |
2017-02-17 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2017-02-01 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2017-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A08301 (Same As) 2017-06-28 - substituted by s2414