NY S02406 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-29 - PRINT NUMBER 2406A
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-29 - PRINT NUMBER 2406A
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a photo radar demonstration program in cities of one million or more imposing civil liability upon vehicle owners for maximum speed limit violations; authorizes such program to install a photo radar device on McGuinness Boulevard in the borough of Brooklyn; provides for the repeal of such demonstration program after three years.
Title
Authorizes a photo radar demonstration program in cities of one million or more imposing civil liability upon vehicle owners for maximum speed limit violations; authorizes such program to install a photo radar device on McGuinness Boulevard in the borough of Brooklyn; provides for the repeal of such demonstration program after three years.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-29 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2406A |
2016-04-29 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2015-01-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A00645 (Same As) 2016-05-03 - print number 645a