NY S02399 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-25 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-25 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the registration of certain farm vehicles.
Title
Relates to the registration of certain farm vehicles.
Sponsors
Sen. Patricia Ritchie [R] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] | Sen. John Bonacic [R] | Sen. Patrick Gallivan [R] |
Sen. Michael Ranzenhofer [R] | Sen. James Seward [R] | Sen. David Valesky [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-25 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2016-05-25 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-05-25 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-05-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-05-18 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-05-17 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.897 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2015-05-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-05-28 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-05-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-05-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.732 |
2015-01-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A01429 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - referred to transportation