NY S02388 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-27 - referred to local governments
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-27 - referred to local governments
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes industrial development agencies to provide technical and financial assistance to agricultural producers for products grown, harvested or produced within the state.
Title
Authorizes industrial development agencies to provide technical and financial assistance to agricultural producers for products grown, harvested or produced within the state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-27 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2018-02-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-02-27 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-02-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-02-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.394 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-02-13 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2017-02-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-02-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-02-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-02-06 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-01-31 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.127 |
2017-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |