NY S02387 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-7)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes veterans' and disabled veterans' credits to be added to an individual's civil service examination after the establishment of the appropriate eligible list.
Title
Authorizes veterans' and disabled veterans' credits to be added to an individual's civil service examination after the establishment of the appropriate eligible list.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | Assembly | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2018-02-06 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2018-02-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-02-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-01-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-01-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-17 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.193 |
2018-01-12 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2017-03-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-03-27 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-03-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-03-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.290 |
2017-02-17 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2017-02-01 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2017-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A04361 (Same As) 2018-01-31 - opinion referred to judiciary