NY S02377 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-12 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the veterans health care information program to provide information concerning health issues to veteran's children; requires the department of corrections and community supervision to maintain records regarding the military background of certain individuals under its jurisdiction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the veterans health care information program to provide information concerning health issues to veteran's children; requires the department of corrections and community supervision to maintain records regarding the military background of certain individuals under its jurisdiction.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-12Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-02-12Assemblypassed assembly
2019-02-12Assemblyordered to third reading cal.39
2019-02-12Assemblysubstituted for a1804
2019-02-05Assemblyreferred to veterans' affairs
2019-02-05SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-02-05SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-02-04SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-01-29Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-01-28Senate1ST REPORT CAL.56
2019-01-24SenateREFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS

Same As/Similar To

A01804 (Same As) 2019-02-12 - substituted by s2377

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback