NY S02377 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-26 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits the sale and distribution of dietary supplements containing DMAA and foods containing an unsafe DMAA food additive.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits the sale and distribution of dietary supplements containing DMAA and foods containing an unsafe DMAA food additive.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-26Assemblyreferred to health
2014-03-26SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2014-03-26SenatePASSED SENATE
2014-02-11SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2014-02-10Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2014-02-04Senate1ST REPORT CAL.99
2014-01-08SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH
2014-01-08Assemblyreturned to senate
2014-01-08Assemblydied in assembly
2013-06-12Assemblyreferred to health
2013-06-12SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2013-06-12SenatePASSED SENATE
2013-06-11SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1240
2013-06-11SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2013-05-24SenatePRINT NUMBER 2377A
2013-05-24SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE
2013-05-07SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2013-01-17SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH

Same As/Similar To

A04613 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - referred to health

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback