NY S02377 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-21 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes peace officers designated by the superintendent of insurance/financial services to execute arrest warrants and search warrants.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes peace officers designated by the superintendent of insurance/financial services to execute arrest warrants and search warrants.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-06-21SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2012-05-07SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2012-05-02Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2012-05-01Senate1ST REPORT CAL.661
2012-04-11SenatePRINT NUMBER 2377B
2012-04-11SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE
2012-03-20SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2012-01-04SenateREFERRED TO CODES
2011-05-24SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2011-05-12SenatePRINT NUMBER 2377A
2011-05-12SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CODES
2011-01-19SenateREFERRED TO CODES

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback