NY S02372 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides a constitutional guarantee that the legislature shall provide for the maintenance and support of a system of free public libraries, wherein all the residents of this state may be provided with public library services.
Title
Provides a constitutional guarantee that the legislature shall provide for the maintenance and support of a system of free public libraries, wherein all the residents of this state may be provided with public library services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2018-01-12 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2017-02-17 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2017-02-01 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2017-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A02550 (Same As) 2018-01-31 - opinion referred to judiciary