NY S02356 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires that academic credit toward a high school diploma be given for practical experience gained outside of school during high school.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires that academic credit toward a high school diploma be given for practical experience gained outside of school during high school.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO EDUCATION
2024-01-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2024-01-03Assemblydied in assembly
2023-06-06Assemblyreferred to education
2023-06-06SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-06-06SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-06-01SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1461
2023-06-01SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2023-01-20SenateREFERRED TO EDUCATION

Same As/Similar To

A02308 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to education

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback