NY S02355 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-12 - referred to consumer affairs and protection
Pending: Assembly Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Directs the department of state and the public service commission to study and report upon the prevalence of the disclosure by public utilities, cable television companies and cellular telephone service providers to credit reporting agencies of late payments and defaults in payment of fees and charges by consumers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directs the department of state and the public service commission to study and report upon the prevalence of the disclosure by public utilities, cable television companies and cellular telephone service providers to credit reporting agencies of late payments and defaults in payment of fees and charges by consumers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-12Assemblyreferred to consumer affairs and protection
2019-02-12SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-02-12SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-02-11SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-02-05Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-02-04Senate1ST REPORT CAL.118
2019-01-24SenateREFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS

Same As/Similar To

A02330 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - referred to consumer affairs and protection

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback