NY S02352 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-04 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Directs the state energy planning board to conduct a study of the technical and economic feasibility of a one hundred percent renewable energy system and a reduction in greenhouse gas emissions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directs the state energy planning board to conduct a study of the technical and economic feasibility of a one hundred percent renewable energy system and a reduction in greenhouse gas emissions.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-04SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-02-28Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-02-27Senate1ST REPORT CAL.170
2019-02-21SenatePRINT NUMBER 2352A
2019-02-21SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
2019-01-24SenateREFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS

Same As/Similar To

A02720 (Same As) 2019-03-12 - reported referred to ways and means

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback