NY S02339 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A581
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A581
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to cancellation of certain membership camping contracts; amends provisions relating to the use of certain information provided by victims of domestic violence.
Title
Relates to cancellation of certain membership camping contracts; amends provisions relating to the use of certain information provided by victims of domestic violence.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A581 |
2013-03-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-02-28 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-02-27 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.107 |
2013-01-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A00581 (Same As) 2013-04-09 - signed chap.17