NY S02336 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on August 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-13 - VETOED MEMO.194
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on August 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-13 - VETOED MEMO.194
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a New York state physical fitness and activity education campaign.
Title
Establishes a New York state physical fitness and activity education campaign.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-13 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.194 |
2015-08-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.138 |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | substituted for a7022 |
2015-05-20 | Assembly | referred to health |
2015-05-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-05-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-05-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-05-06 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.561 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2015-01-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A07022 (Same As) 2015-06-09 - substituted by s2336