NY S02334 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-22 - PRINT NUMBER 2334A
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-22 - PRINT NUMBER 2334A
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the immigration provider enforced disclosure information and registration (IMPEDIR) act.
Title
Enacts the immigration provider enforced disclosure information and registration (IMPEDIR) act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2334A |
2018-02-22 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2017-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A08567 (Same As) 2017-12-15 - enacting clause stricken