NY S02319 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-15 - referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-15 - referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the short term military service guardian; allows parent without joint custody to appoint service guardian; provides for a maximum appointment of 180 days.
Title
Creates the short term military service guardian; allows parent without joint custody to appoint service guardian; provides for a maximum appointment of 180 days.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2018-05-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-05-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-04-25 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-04-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.842 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-05-10 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2017-05-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-05-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-04-26 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-04-25 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.561 |
2017-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
A00815 (Same As) 2018-05-31 - held for consideration in judiciary