NY S02306 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-16 - PRINT NUMBER 2306B
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-16 - PRINT NUMBER 2306B
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the field testing for use of mobile telephones and portable electronic devices while driving after an accident or collision; allows police departments the option to participate in such field testing.
Title
Provides for the field testing for use of mobile telephones and portable electronic devices while driving after an accident or collision; allows police departments the option to participate in such field testing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2306B |
2018-05-16 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2018-02-06 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-01-25 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2306A |
2018-01-25 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2017-03-21 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2017-01-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A03955 (Same As) 2018-06-05 - held for consideration in transportation