NY S02296 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - referred to economic development
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Allows businesses to use funds received from minority- and women-owned business development and lending program for the purpose of refinancing existing debt.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows businesses to use funds received from minority- and women-owned business development and lending program for the purpose of refinancing existing debt.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-17Assemblyreferred to economic development
2019-06-17SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-17SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-17SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1417
2019-06-17SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2019-06-12SenatePRINT NUMBER 2296A
2019-06-12SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS
2019-01-23SenateREFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS

Same As/Similar To

A01819 (Same As) 2019-01-17 - referred to economic development

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback