NY S02288 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the appropriate rent control agency or administrative agency or supervising agency to send a notice of required renewal to each head of household currently receiving an exemption under the SCRIE program 30 days prior to the application renewal date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the appropriate rent control agency or administrative agency or supervising agency to send a notice of required renewal to each head of household currently receiving an exemption under the SCRIE program 30 days prior to the application renewal date.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-26SenateRECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
2019-02-26Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-02-12Senate1ST REPORT CAL.157
2019-01-23SenateREFERRED TO AGING

Same As/Similar To

S04060 (Same As) 2019-03-26 - referred to aging

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback