NY S02288 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-25 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-25 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires electric corporations to submit electric utility emergency plans to the public service commission for review and approval; provides such plans shall set forth training and planning for power outages, procedures to determine the extent of outages, procedures to determine the length of time the outages will continue, load relief policies, decision making plans, and any other information such commission requires; annually requires electric corporations file emergency plans and verification of the ability to implement such plan; requires electric corporations to report to the public service commission within 60 days of an outage which lasts more than 48 hours.
Title
Requires electric corporations to submit electric utility emergency plans to the public service commission for review and approval; provides such plans shall set forth training and planning for power outages, procedures to determine the extent of outages, procedures to determine the length of time the outages will continue, load relief policies, decision making plans, and any other information such commission requires; annually requires electric corporations file emergency plans and verification of the ability to implement such plan; requires electric corporations to report to the public service commission within 60 days of an outage which lasts more than 48 hours.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-25 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | |
2010-05-03 | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED | |
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS | |
2009-06-19 | PRINT NUMBER 2288A | |
2009-06-19 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS | |
2009-02-17 | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A1557-A (Same As) 2010-02-02 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS