NY S02284 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to manufacturers' reporting the sale or distribution of firearms to the department of criminal justice services.
Title
Relates to manufacturers' reporting the sale or distribution of firearms to the department of criminal justice services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-04-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.756 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2023-06-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-02-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-02-14 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-02-13 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.342 |
2023-01-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |