NY S02279 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-6)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-27 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-27 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the state of New York a purple heart state.
Title
Designates the state of New York a purple heart state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-27 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2022-04-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-04-27 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-01-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-01-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.93 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2021-06-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-02-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-02-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.214 |
2021-01-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07961 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to governmental operations