NY S02248 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - referred to veterans' affairs
Pending: Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - referred to veterans' affairs
Pending: Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a veterans' mental health and suicide prevention task force to examine, evaluate and determine how to improve mental health and suicide prevention for our veterans.
Title
Creates a veterans' mental health and suicide prevention task force to examine, evaluate and determine how to improve mental health and suicide prevention for our veterans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-21 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
2020-07-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-03-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-03-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.546 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2020-02-03 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2248A |
2020-02-03 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
2019-05-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-30 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-30 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.996 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-04-09 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-01-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
A08248 (Same As) 2020-02-04 - print number 8248a