NY S02245 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - 2ND REPORT CAL.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Increases the number of authorized withdrawal transactions at no charge from basic banking accounts for account holders sixty-five years of age or older from eight to twelve.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increases the number of authorized withdrawal transactions at no charge from basic banking accounts for account holders sixty-five years of age or older from eight to twelve.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-10Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-04-09Senate1ST REPORT CAL.414
2019-01-23SenateREFERRED TO BANKS

Same As/Similar To

A01940 (Same As) 2019-01-18 - referred to banks

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback