NY S02239 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5773
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5773
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to equal pay disclosure with respect to state contracts.
Title
Relates to equal pay disclosure with respect to state contracts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A5773 |
2022-06-01 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1741 |
2022-06-01 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO PROCUREMENT AND CONTRACTS |
2021-01-25 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO PROCUREMENT AND CONTRACTS |
2021-01-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A05773 (Same As) 2022-12-23 - tabled