NY S02238 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-8)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6551B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6551B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to requiring specific reserved bed days at New York State Veterans' Homes.
Title
Relates to requiring specific reserved bed days at New York State Veterans' Homes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-02 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A6551B |
2022-06-02 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1887 |
2022-06-02 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-02-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2238B |
2022-02-14 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2022-01-31 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2238A |
2022-01-31 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2021-01-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A06551 (Same As) 2022-11-10 - signed chap.586