NY S02231 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-19 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-19 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Removes constitutional provision that the lieutenant-governor shall act as governor when the governor is absent from the state; also provides likewise for the case in which the lieutenant-governor is absent from the state and the case in which the temporary president of the senate is absent from the state.
Title
Removes constitutional provision that the lieutenant-governor shall act as governor when the governor is absent from the state; also provides likewise for the case in which the lieutenant-governor is absent from the state and the case in which the temporary president of the senate is absent from the state.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-19 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2014-01-13 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2013-02-15 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2013-01-22 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2013-01-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A02707 (Same As) 2014-02-05 - opinion referred to judiciary