NY S02227 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-14 - SUBSTITUTED BY A978
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires gas corporations to file annual gas safety reports; authorizes the public service commission to order reasonable improvements to promote public interest, preserve public health and protect those using gas when there is a deficiency in a gas corporation's prioritization or administration of its pipeline replacement projects or operation and maintenance activities related to gas safety.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires gas corporations to file annual gas safety reports; authorizes the public service commission to order reasonable improvements to promote public interest, preserve public health and protect those using gas when there is a deficiency in a gas corporation's prioritization or administration of its pipeline replacement projects or operation and maintenance activities related to gas safety.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-14SenateSUBSTITUTED BY A978
2023-01-23SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.164
2023-01-19SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A00978 (Same As) 2023-03-03 - signed chap.33

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback