NY S02224 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes that domestic violence advocates may not disclose any communication made by a client to the advocate except in certain circumstances including after the consent of the client or if the client reveals an intent to commit a crime.
Title
Establishes that domestic violence advocates may not disclose any communication made by a client to the advocate except in certain circumstances including after the consent of the client or if the client reveals an intent to commit a crime.
Sponsors
Sen. James Sanders [D] | Sen. Peter Harckham [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] | Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] |
Sen. Timothy Kennedy [D] | Sen. John Liu [D] | Sen. James Skoufis [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-21 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2020-07-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-21 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.141 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2019-05-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-08 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 2224B |
2019-05-06 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 2224A |
2019-02-26 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-02-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.141 |
2019-01-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A07775 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to judiciary