NY S02211 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-03 - SIGNED CHAP.570
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-03 - SIGNED CHAP.570
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the prohibition of double-bunked housing in correctional facilities.
Title
Relates to the prohibition of double-bunked housing in correctional facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-03 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.570 |
2021-10-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.411 |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | substituted for a702 |
2021-04-28 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2021-04-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-04-28 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-02-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-02-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.393 |
2021-01-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A00702 (Same As) 2021-06-07 - substituted by s2211