NY S02202 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to conducting a study on various approaches to increasing broadband access within this state.
Title
Relates to conducting a study on various approaches to increasing broadband access within this state.
Sponsors
Sen. Jamaal Bailey [D] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Rachel May [D] | Sen. Jen Metzger [D] |
Sen. Zellnor Myrie [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-03-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-03-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.263 |
2019-01-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |